This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 12/02/2018 at 06:08:15 (UTC).

In the Estate of Amanda Lumsden, Deceased

Case Summary

On 03/02/2018 In the Estate of Amanda Lumsden, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Kelly, Lynn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********61-2

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Kelly, Lynn

 

Party Details

Applicant and Executor

Lumsden, Joseph B.

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Decedent

Lumsden, Amanda

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant and Executor Attorney

CHARLES PUFF

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2018
  • 306 Notice Doc ID#13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • Order Approving Inventory, Appraisment & List of Claims Doc ID#12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • Inventory Appraise Claims -no fee w/in 90 days qualification Doc ID#11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • Notice to Creditors Doc ID#10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • 306 Notice Doc ID#9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • Order Admit Will to Probate & Granting Letters Testamentary Doc ID#8: Independent Executor w/o Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • Oath Doc ID#7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • Proof of Death and other Facts Doc ID#6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • Probate Of Will Hearing: (10:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerKelly, Lynn) : Result: Order Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • Will - Original Doc ID#5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • Citation - Poster: Return Date 03/19/2018 - RFC 03/05/18 Env# 22913475; Public Notice: Served: 03/07/2018; Returned: 03/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • Will - Copy Doc ID#4: 8 pages total per Cynthia Puff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • Probate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Doc ID#3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • Civil Case Information Sheet Doc ID#2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • Application for Probate of Will Doc ID#1: Pd $4 JF, Pd $8 for Letters

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # PR-0342985: PUFF; CHARLES: (17.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • Transaction Assessment: 17.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-81368: Lumsden, Joe B.: (268.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • Financial Information: Applicant Lumsden, Joseph B.; Total Financial Assessment: 285.00; Total Payments and Credits: 285.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 268.00

    Read MoreRead Less