Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 07/22/2021 at 06:47:41 (UTC).

In the Estate of Alice Evelyn Riley, Deceased

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 In the Estate of Alice Evelyn Riley, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Allen, Brooke U. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********80-2

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Allen, Brooke U

 

Party Details

Decedent

Riley, Alice Evelyn Also Known As Riley, Evelyn

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Applicant and Executor

Riley, Mark

Saginaw, TX 76131

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant and Executor Attorney

Kaitlin Rae Travis

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-119119: Riley, Mark: (10.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketRequest Index # 13: for Letters Pd $4 Jfs Pd $4 Ltrs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketOath Index # 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • Docket306 Notice Index # 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketOrder Admit Will to Probate & Granting Letters Testamentary Index # 11: Without Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Subscribing Witness Index # 10: Carol Ann Osborn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Death and other Facts Index # 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document Index # 8: - Received Detatched from Will

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketWill - Original Index # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/25/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index # 6: 5/27/2021 10:30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketDeclination to Serve Index # 5: and Consent Matthew Riley

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketDeclination to Serve Index # 4: and Consent Rhonda Riley

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketWill - Original Index # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-115015: Riley, Mark: (256.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Riley, Mark; Total Financial Assessment: 268.00; Total Payments and Credits: 268.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 256.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 04/12/2021; Public Notice: Served: 04/01/2021; Returned: 04/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketWill - Copy Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketApplication for Probate of Will Index # 1: Owes $4 JF and Letters

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kaitlin Rae Travis