Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 02/01/2021 at 21:24:58 (UTC).

In the Estate of Alfred L. Coggin, Deceased

Case Summary

On 01/28/2020 In the Estate of Alfred L Coggin, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Ponder, Christopher W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********73-1

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Ponder, Christopher W

 

Party Details

Decedent

Coggin, Alfred L.

Arlington, TX 76013

Applicant and Executor

Coggin, Donald L.

Arlington, TX 76107

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant and Executor Attorney

Reid A. Rector

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2020
  • FinancialCounter Payment: Receipt # PR-0358872: Rector, Reid A.: (20.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketNotice to Creditors Index #13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • Docket306 Notice Index #12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketOrder Approving Inventory, Appraisment & List of Claims Index #11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketInventory Appraise Claims -no fee w/in 90 days qualification Index #10: Inventory, Appraisement and List of Claims

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-103991: Coggin, Donald L.: (2.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketOath Index #9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Death and other Facts Index #8

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index #5: June 17, 2020 at 11:00 via Zoom

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-99978: Coggin, Donald L.: (6.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-99759: Coggin, Donald L.: (256.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Coggin, Donald L.; Total Financial Assessment: 286.00; Total Payments and Credits: 286.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 256.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketWill - Original Index #4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 2/10/2020; Public Notice: Served: 01/30/2020; Returned: 01/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketWill - Copy Index #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketApplication for Probate of Will Index #1: Owes $4 JF & Ltrs

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Reid Rector