This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/03/2021 at 06:07:46 (UTC).

In the Estate of Alejo Sanchez Castaneda, Deceased

Case Summary

On 03/03/2021 In the Estate of Alejo Sanchez Castaneda, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********68-1

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

Gonzalez, Inocencia

Fort Worth, TX 76106

Decedent

Castaneda, Alejo Sanchez

Fort Worth, TX 76106

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2021
  • Docket306 Notice Index #7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketCertified Copy Index #6: 1 CC of SE Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketOrder Approving Small Estate Affidavit Index #5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • FinancialCounter Payment: Receipt # PR-0362025: Gonzalez, Inocencia: (268.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Distributee Gonzalez, Inocencia; Total Financial Assessment: 268.00; Total Payments and Credits: 268.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 268.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 03/15/2021; Public Notice: Served: 03/04/2021; Returned: 03/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Information Sheet Index #4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document Index #2: Death Certificate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketSmall Estate Affidavit Index #1

    Read MoreRead Less