Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 02/03/2021 at 21:44:20 (UTC).

In the Estate of Alan Scott Turner, Deceased

Case Summary

On 05/19/2020 In the Estate of Alan Scott Turner, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are Ponder, Christopher W and McGown, Quentin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********81-1

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

Ponder, Christopher W

McGown, Quentin

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Applicant and Executor

Wyant, Zachary Also Known As Wyant, John Zachary

Dodd City, TX 75438

Decedent

Turner, Alan Scott

Fort Worth, TX 76137

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant and Executor Attorney

H. Dean Owen, JR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2020
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-105087: Wyant, Zachary: (2.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketAssoc. Judge Order Approved by Presiding Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • Docket306 Notice Index #8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketOath Index #10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Death and other Facts Index #9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketOrder Admit Will to Probate & Granting Letters Testamentary Index #7: w/o bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketProbate Of Will Hearing: (3:00 PM) (Judicial OfficerMcGown, Quentin) : Result: Order Signed: via zoom

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index #6: 07/16/2020 at 3:00 pm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-104683: Wyant, Zachary: (2.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketWill - Original Index #5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketCorrespondence Index #4: Re Will

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-102969: Wyant, John Zachary: (280.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Wyant, Zachary; Total Financial Assessment: 284.00; Total Payments and Credits: 284.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 280.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 06-01-20; Public Notice: Served: 05/21/2020; Returned: 05/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketWill - Copy Index #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketApplication for Probate of Will Index #1: PD $4 JF, PD $20 for Letters

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer H. Dean Owen, JR