Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/23/2021 at 06:14:54 (UTC).

In the Estate of Aaron Creed Minnis, Deceased

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 In the Estate of Aaron Creed Minnis, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********65-2

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

Minnis, Ida Beavers

Keller, TX 76248

Minnis, Creed William, JR

Keller, TX 76248

Decedent

Minnis, Aaron Creed

Keller, TX 76248

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court and Decedent Attorney

Lorraine Irby

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2021
  • Docket306 Notice Index #5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketCertified Copy Index #4: Se and Order mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketOrder Approving Small Estate Affidavit Index #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-113739: Minnis, Creed William: (268.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Distributee Minnis, Creed William, JR; Total Financial Assessment: 268.00; Total Payments and Credits: 268.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 268.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 3/15/21; Public Notice: Served: 03/04/2021; Returned: 03/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document Index #2: Death Certificate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketSmall Estate Affidavit Index #1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lorraine Irby