Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 10/16/2020 at 21:58:24 (UTC).

In Re: The Estate of Robert Glen Parmer, Deceased; Sandra K. Dipretore, Individ. and as Next Friend of Z. P., A Minor, and as Admininstrator of the Estate of Robert Glen Parmer, Plaintiff vs. Ozark Motor Lines, Inc., Katelyn Sillivan and Valerie Will

Case Summary

On 11/28/2018 In Re The Estate of Robert Glen Parmer, Deceased Sandra K Dipretore, Individ and as Next Friend of Z P , A Minor, and as Admininstrator of the Estate of Robert Glen Parmer, Plaintiff filed a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit against Ozark Motor Lines, Inc , Katelyn Sillivan and Valerie Will. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Allen, Brooke U. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************-2-A

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Allen, Brooke U

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

DiPretore, Sandra

Sandra DiPretore as Heir as Law of Amberlyn Parmer, Deceased Minor

Sandra DiPretore as Heir at Law of Amberlyn Parmer, Deceased Minor

Sandra DiPretore as Next Friend of Z.P., a Minor

Sandra DiPretore, as Administrator of the Estate of Robert Glen Parmer

Defendants and Counter Plaintiffs

Ozark Motor Lines, Inc.

Williams, Valerie

Sheppard Afb, TX 76311

Sillavan, Katelyn

Lockesburg, AR 71846-9676

CT Corporation System, Registered Agent

1999 Brayn Street 900

Dallas, TX 75201-3136

FCA US LLC

1999 Brayn Street 900

Dallas, TX 75201-3136

Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V.

25 St. James'S Street London Sw1A 1Ha

United Kingdom, GBR

Minor

**Confidential**

Decedent

Parmer, Robert Glen

Defendants and Intervenors

Williams, Valerie

Sheppard Afb, TX 76311

Parmer, Lillie Nichols

Parmer, Tommie Glen

Sandra DiPretore as Heir as Law of Amberlyn Parmer, Deceased Minor

Sandra DiPretore as Heir at Law of Amberlyn Parmer, Deceased Minor

Not Classified By Court

Champion Records

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Counter Defendant and Intervenor Attorneys

STEVEN C LAIRD

Steven C. Laird

Robert L. Collins

Defendant and Counter Plaintiff Attorneys

Paul M. Boyd

H KENT TWINING

Stephen C. Maxwell

Kevin G. Giddens

Alexander J. Pennetti

Defendant and Intervenor Attorneys

Stephen C. Maxwell

Robert L. Collins

DAVID M NIX

David M. Nix

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketJury Trial Hearing: (9:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerAllen, Brooke U.) : 07/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketJury Trial Hearing: (9:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerAllen, Brooke U.) : 07/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketJury Trial Hearing: (9:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerAllen, Brooke U.) : 07/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketJury Trial Hearing: (9:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerAllen, Brooke U.) : 07/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketJury Trial Hearing: (9:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerAllen, Brooke U.) : Firm@RobertCollinsLaw.com Alex.Pennetti@bowmanandbrooke.com twining@mckinneytaylor.com pboyd@boydlawtexas.com service@texlawyers.com smaxwell@galyen.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketMiscellaneous - Probate Hearing: (2:00 PM) (Judicial OfficerAllen, Brooke U.) : Zoom Def. Datelyn Sillvan's Motion to quash Plaintiff's Subopena # Deposition by Written Questions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketShow Cause Hearing: (9:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerAllen, Brooke U.) : Spoliation Firm@RobertCollinsLaw.com Alex.Pennetti@bowmanandbrooke.com twining@mckinneytaylor.com pboyd@boydlawtexas.com service@texlawyers.com smaxwell@galyen.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketPre-Trial Hearing: (9:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerAllen, Brooke U.) : 07/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketAnswer/Response Index #676: to Second Amended Joint Partial Traditional and No-Evidence Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index #675: Plaintiffs October 29, 2020 @ 9 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
731 More Docket Entries
  • 11/29/2018
  • DocketCitation - Law Suit: Valerie Williams; Williams, Valerie: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • DocketCitation - Law Suit: Katelyn Sillavan; Sillavan, Katelyn: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • DocketCitation - Law Suit: Ozark Motor Lines, Inc; Ozark Motor Lines, Inc.: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PR-0347563: DiPretore, Sandra: (331.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Counter Defendant DiPretore, Sandra; Total Financial Assessment: 574.00; Total Payments and Credits: 574.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 331.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketAffidavit Index #5: of Lee Jackson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order Index #4: and Setting Hearing for Temporary Injunction Against Ozark Motor Lines, INC. and Granting Expedited Discovery to Ozark Motor Lines, INC and Katelyn Sillavan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketPlaintiff's Original Petition Index #3: Plaintiffs' Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Injunction against Ozark Motor Lines, Inc., Motion to Expedite Discovery to Ozark Motor Lines, Inc., and Katelyn Sillavan, and Plaintiffs' Original Petition with Request for Disclosures to all Defendants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketCertificate Index #2: of Emergency Relief

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketBond - Cash Index #1: $500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V. is a litigant

Latest cases where FCA US LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert L. Collins

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen C. Maxwell