Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/16/2021 at 08:10:27 (UTC).

IMAP Transportation, Inc. vs RBC Life Sciences, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 IMAP Transportation, Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RBC Life Sciences, Inc. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********79-1

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

d/b/a IMAP Global Logistics

IMAP Transportation, Inc.

Defendants

dba RBC Life Sciences USA Inc, RBC Life Sciences, and Royal Body Care Inc.

1999 Bryan St., Ste. 900

Dallas, TX 75201

b/s its registered agent, CT Corporation System

1999 Bryan St., Ste. 900

Dallas, TX 75201

RBC Life Sciences, Inc.

1999 Bryan St., Ste. 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David W. Roth

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketPaper Returned Index #4: (RBC Life Sciences Inc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-170074: IMAP Transportation, Inc.: (258.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff IMAP Transportation, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment: 258.00; Total Payments and Credits: 258.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 258.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCitation: Hold for attorney Roth p/u - picked up 03/11; RBC Life Sciences, Inc.: Served: 03/18/2021; Returned: 03/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketLetter Index #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index #1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where dba RBC Life Sciences USA Inc, RBC Life Sciences, and Royal Body Care Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David W. Roth