This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 06/25/2022 at 08:44:00 (UTC).

Huntsman Building Solutions, LLC vs Johnson HVAC Services, LLC dba Johnson Mechanical Services

Case Summary

On 01/27/2022 Huntsman Building Solutions, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Johnson HVAC Services, LLC dba Johnson Mechanical Services. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Hrabal, Mike. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********22-3

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Hrabal, Mike

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Huntsman Building Solutions, LLC

a domestic corporation

Defendants

Johnson HVAC Services, LLC

901 Malone Street

Brownwood, TX 76801

dba Johnson Mechanical Services

b/s registered agent, Mitch Johnson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Benjamin M. Bonney

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketRule 239a Notice of Default Judgment Index # 10: Electronically served to Party's attorney and/or mailed to all pro-se parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketDispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Hrabal, Mike)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketJudgment - Default Index # 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketAffidavit of Attorney Fees Index # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Last Known Address Index # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketMotion for Default W/Supporting Affidavits Index # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 5: Return of Service - Johnson HVAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-180011: Huntsman Building Solutions, LLC: (8.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketCitation: E-mailed to Attorney 02-25-2022; Johnson HVAC Services, LLC: Served: 03/02/2022; Returned: 03/08/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketLetter Index # 4: RE: Issuance of Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (137.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-179508: Huntsman Building Solutions, LLC: (213.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Huntsman Building Solutions, LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 358.00; Total Payments and Credits: 358.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 350.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketAffidavit Index # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Huntsman Building Solutions, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where A DOMESTIC CORP. B/S ITS REG. AGENT JEFF A WOOLEY AT, is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benjamin M. Bonney