Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 06/04/2017 at 22:30:19 (UTC).

HUNTERS COVE APARTMENTS vs. ANITA HILL AND ALL OCCUPANTS

Case Summary

On 05/11/2017 HUNTERS COVE APARTMENTS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ANITA HILL AND ALL OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 7 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Hayes, Matt. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5150

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 7

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Hayes, Matt

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HUNTERS COVE APARTMENTS

3056 Commodore Dr

Grand Prairie, TX 75052

Defendant

HILL, ANITA

Grand Prairie, TX 75052

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2017
  • Dispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Hayes, Matt) ; Judgment of $852.48; Awarded To: HUNTERS COVE APARTMENTS; Awarded Against: ANITA HILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • Defn Paid Rent into Court Registry on Appeal: $1,149.00. JAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • Statement of Inability to Pay for Appeal Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • Statement of Inability to Pay for Appeal Not Contested: BY FAX KSM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • Comments: FAXED APPEAL DOCS KSM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • Plaintiff Contacted Court: WANTS APPEAL INFO FAXED TO HER. GAVE NOTE TO KAREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • Contacted PLTF on Statement of Inability to Pay for Appeal: LEFT VM. MAILED APPEAL DOCS KSM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • Notice Given to Defn of Rent to be Paid on Eviction Appeal: 1149.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • Eviction - Statement of Inability to Pay for Appeal Filed:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • Bond for Appeal Set: 2301.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • Evict - Default Judgment for Possession, Past Due Rent, & CC: 852.48 PLUS CC INT AND POSS -AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • Hearing: (8:30 AM) (Judicial OfficerHayes, Matt) : Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • EVICTION: HILL, ANITA: Served: 05/15/2017; Returned: 05/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • Original Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # JP7-2017-02904: HUNTERS COVE APARTMENTS: (116.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff HUNTERS COVE APARTMENTS; Total Financial Assessment: 116.00; Total Payments and Credits: 116.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 116.00

    Read MoreRead Less