This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 03/16/2017 at 18:28:04 (UTC).

HULEN 121 LLC DBA HULEN HILLS vs. MARQUEICE BROWN AND ALL OCCUPANTS

Case Summary

On 10/15/2015 HULEN 121 LLC DBA HULEN HILLS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MARQUEICE BROWN AND ALL OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 5 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is DE LEON, SERGIO L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4067

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

DE LEON, SERGIO L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HULEN 121 LLC DBA HULEN HILLS

1501 S Loop 288 Ste 104-144

Denton, TX 76205

Defendant

BROWN, MARQUEICE

Fort Worth, TX 76107

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2015
  • Dispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: DE LEON, SERGIO L) ; Judgment of $983.87; Awarded To: HULEN 121 LLC DBA HULEN HILLS; Awarded Against: MARQUEICE BROWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • Bond for Appeal Set: AT $1,800

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • During the Pendency of Appeal, the Interm Rent Due Is: $500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • Default Notice Mailed: TO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • Evict - Default Judgment for Possession, Past Due Rent, & CC: $983.87 PAST DUE RENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • Hearing: (9:30 AM) () : Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • EVICTION: 102115 ALIAS CITN RETD/EXECUTED 102015/BY ALTERNATE SERVICE/ATTACHED/MAILED/SET FOR TRAIL (103015 @ 9:30AM); BROWN, MARQUEICE: Served: 10/20/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • Request For Alternate Service Filed and Approved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • EVICTION: CITN RETD/REQUEST FOR ALTERNATE SERVICE; BROWN, MARQUEICE: Returned Unserved 10/19/2015; Returned: 10/19/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • Military Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • Generate Label

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • Original Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # JP5-2015-02468: KATHY THANKERSLEY: (116.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff HULEN 121 LLC DBA HULEN HILLS; Total Financial Assessment: 116.00; Total Payments and Credits: 116.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 116.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HULEN 121 LLC DBA HULEN HILLS is a litigant