This case was last updated from Tarrant County Court on 09/16/2023 at 02:03:35 (UTC).

Hilda Gonzales vs The Estate of Terry Fleming and Law Offices of Terry Fleming

Case Summary

On 11/09/2022 Hilda Gonzales filed an Other lawsuit against The Estate of Terry Fleming and Law Offices of Terry Fleming. This case was filed in Tarrant County Court, County Court at Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********03-1

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gonzales, Hilda

Defendants

Law Offices of Terry Fleming

B/S Executor or Heir, Elaine Fleming

The Estate of Terry Fleming

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert Haslam

Defendant Attorney

CARRIE J PHANEUF

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2023
  • DocketCertified Deposition of Custody Records Index # 46: (Quantum Pain & Sports Medicine - Radiology)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2023
  • DocketCertified Deposition of Custody Records Index # 45: (Quantum Pain & Sports Medicine - Medical)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2023
  • DocketNotice to Take Deposition Index # 44: Video Deposition of Winnie Cener

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2023
  • DocketVacation Letter Index # 43

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Deposition Index # 42: Certificate of Court Costs (Prime Diagnostic Imaging)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Deposition Index # 41: and Notice of Delivery (Farmers Insurance Exchange - Insurance)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2023
  • DocketNotice to Take Deposition Index # 40: Second Amended; Quantum Pain & Sports Medicine

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2023
  • DocketCertified Deposition of Custody Records Index # 39: (MRI Centers of Texas LLC / Radiology)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Deposition Index # 38: Rule 203 Certificate of Court Costs (Touchstone Imaging Red Oak)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Deposition Index # 37: Rule 203 Certification of Court Cost (Methodist Moody Brian and Spine Institute)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketVacation Letter Index # 6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketDefendant's Original Answer Index # 5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 4: - The Estate of Terry Fleming

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 3: - Law Offices of Terry Fleming

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (137.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-187324: Gonzales, Hilda: (229.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Gonzales, Hilda; Total Financial Assessment: 366.00; Total Payments and Credits: 366.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 366.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketCitation: Mailed to Attorney 11/09/22; The Estate of Terry Fleming: Served: 11/23/2022; Returned: 11/29/2022; Law Offices of Terry Fleming: Served: 11/23/2022; Returned: 11/29/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less