Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 10/05/2017 at 07:00:50 (UTC).

HIEP TRAN AND TRANG DO vs. LG BUILDING & CONSTRUCTION AND HIEP NGUYEN

Case Summary

On 07/20/2017 HIEP TRAN AND TRANG DO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LG BUILDING CONSTRUCTION AND HIEP NGUYEN. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************9805

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TRAN, HIEP

Arlington, TX 76018

DO, TRANG

Arlington, TX 76018

Defendants

NGUYEN, HIEP

Fort Worth, TX 76111

LG BUILDING & CONSTRUCTION

1215 Viridian Park Lane

Arlington, TX 76005

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2017
  • Answer Filed: W/MOTION TO DISMISS - MAILED COPY TO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • Answer Due On: DEF 1 & 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • CITATION: LG BUILDING & CONSTRUCTION: Served: 09/11/2017; NGUYEN, HIEP: Served: 09/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • Amended Petition Filed: TO BE SERVED BY PPS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • Plaintiff Contacted Court: PLTF CAME TO COURT TO ADVISE THEY WILL BE HIRING A PPS - I ADVISED HIM THE CASE WOULD BE HELD FOR 30 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • Citation Returned Unexecuted - Bad Address for Party:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • Military Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • CITATION: LG BUILDING & CONSTRUCTION: Returned Unserved 08/16/2017; Returned: 08/16/2017; NGUYEN, HIEP: Returned Unserved 08/16/2017; Returned: 08/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • Original Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # JP2-2017-02747: TRAN, HIEP: (191.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • Transaction Assessment: 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff TRAN, HIEP; Total Financial Assessment: 191.00; Total Payments and Credits: 191.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 41.00

    Read MoreRead Less