This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 10/07/2021 at 08:02:05 (UTC).

Henry Schein, Inc. vs JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association

Case Summary

On 09/09/2021 Henry Schein, Inc filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********89-1

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Henry Schein, Inc.

Defendants

JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association

1999 Bryan Street, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

b/s registered agent, C T Corporation S

1999 Bryan Street, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

b/s registered agent, C T Corporation System

1999 Bryan Street Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Not Classified By Court

Freedom Mark Dental PA

Euless, TX 76040

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lawrence J. Falli

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketWrit of Garnishment: Mailed to Attorney 9/14/2021; JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-175906: Henry Schein, Inc.: (234.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Henry Schein, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment: 234.00; Total Payments and Credits: 234.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 234.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Post Garnishment Index # 2: Application for Writ of Garnishment after Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Post Garnishment Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Henry Schein, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lawrence J. Falli