This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 03/03/2017 at 08:35:49 (UTC).

HENRY FAMILY TRUST C/O STOTLER REAL ESTATE GROUP LLC vs. AARON WITHERSPOON

Case Summary

On 11/27/2013 HENRY FAMILY TRUST C/O STOTLER REAL ESTATE GROUP LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against AARON WITHERSPOON. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 7 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Hayes, Matt. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2585

  • Filing Date:

    11/27/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 7

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Hayes, Matt

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HENRY FAMILY TRUST C/O STOTLER REAL ESTATE GROUP LLC

Po Box 1099

Mansfield, TX 76063

Defendant

WITHERSPOON, AARON

Arlington, TX 76014

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2013
  • Dispositions: Judgment for Plaintiff; (Judicial Officer: Hayes, Matt) ; Judgment of $2,871.67; Awarded To: HENRY FAMILY TRUST C/O STOTLER REAL ESTATE GROUP LLC; Awarded Against: AARON WITHERSPOON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2014
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION: WITHERSPOON, AARON: Returned Unserved 01/22/2014; Returned: 01/22/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2014
  • Writ of Possession Issued to Constable

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2013
  • Evict -Judgment / Pltf / Poss/ Past Due Rent / CC: (Judicial Officer: Hayes, Matt ) : 2871.67

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2013
  • Hearing: (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Hayes, Matt) : Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2013
  • Motion for Alternate Service Filed and Approved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2013
  • EVICTION: WITHERSPOON, AARON: Served: 12/10/2013; Returned: 12/10/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2013
  • Generate Label

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2013
  • Original Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2014
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # JP7-2014-00109: LARRY W STOTLER: (155.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2014
  • Transaction Assessment: 155.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2013
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # JP7-2013-07511: HENRY FAMILY TRUST C/O STOTLER REAL ESTATE GROUP LLC: (116.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2013
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff HENRY FAMILY TRUST C/O STOTLER REAL ESTATE GROUP LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 271.00; Total Payments and Credits: 271.00; Balance Due as of 03/03/2017: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 116.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE HENRY FAMILY TRUST is a litigant