Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 05/08/2021 at 08:35:48 (UTC).

Heather Hradek vs Colonial County Mutual Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 03/11/2021 Heather Hradek filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Colonial County Mutual Insurance Company. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********84-3

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hradek, Heather

Defendants

b/s its Registered Agent, Corporation Service Company

211 East 7Th Street, Ste 620

Austin, TX 78701

Colonial County Mutual Insurance Company

211 East 7Th Street, Ste 620

Austin, TX 78701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Spencer P. Browne

Defendant Attorney

Eugene Kim

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-171522: Colonial County Mutual Insurance Company: (40.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Defendant Colonial County Mutual Insurance Company; Total Financial Assessment: 40.00; Total Payments and Credits: 40.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketJury Fee Payment Index # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketVacation Letter Index # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketDefendant's Original Answer Index # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 4: (Colonial County Mutual Insurance Company)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-170554: Hradek, Heather: (298.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Hradek, Heather; Total Financial Assessment: 298.00; Total Payments and Credits: 298.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 298.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketCitation: mailed to atty 03/12; Colonial County Mutual Insurance Company: Served: 03/25/2021; Returned: 03/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketJury Fee Payment Index # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COLONIAL COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant