This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 03/15/2017 at 17:38:07 (UTC).

HAROLD VENABLE vs. REBECCA RODRIGUEZ AND ALL OCCUPANTS

Case Summary

On 01/14/2014 HAROLD VENABLE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against REBECCA RODRIGUEZ AND ALL OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 5 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is DE LEON, SERGIO L. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Satisfied.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2107

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Satisfied

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

DE LEON, SERGIO L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VENABLE, HAROLD

Defendant

RODRIGUEZ, REBECCA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2014
  • DocketDispositions: Judgment for Plaintiff; (Judicial Officer: DE LEON, SERGIO L) ; Judgment of $1,500.00; Awarded To: HAROLD VENABLE; Awarded Against: REBECCA RODRIGUEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2014
  • DocketRelease of Judgment Filed and Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2014
  • DocketBond for Appeal Set: (Judicial Officer: DE LEON, SERGIO L ) : AT $3000

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2014
  • DocketDuring the Pendency of Appeal, the Interm Rent Due Is: (Judicial Officer: DE LEON, SERGIO L ) : $400

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2014
  • DocketEvict -Judgment / Pltf / Poss/ Past Due Rent / CC: (Judicial Officer: DE LEON, SERGIO L ) : $1500 PAST DUE RENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2014
  • DocketHearing: (9:30 AM) () : Result: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2014
  • DocketEVICTION: 012114 ALIAS CITN RETD/EXECUTED 011714/BY ALTERNATE SERVICE/ATTACHED/MAILED/SET FOR TRAIL (012914 @ 9:30AM); RODRIGUEZ, REBECCA: Served: 01/17/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2014
  • DocketAffidavit for Alternate Service Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • DocketEVICTION: RODRIGUEZ, REBECCA: Returned Unserved 01/16/2014; Returned: 01/16/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • DocketMilitary Affidavit Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • DocketGenerate Label

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • DocketCounter Payment: Receipt # JP5-2014-00069: VENABLE, HAROLD: (116.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • DocketFinancial Information: Plaintiff VENABLE, HAROLD; Total Financial Assessment: 116.00; Total Payments and Credits: 116.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 116.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less