Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 07/20/2021 at 19:27:33 (UTC).

Hanmi Bank vs Bombay Pizza Company LLC, Viral Patel

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 Hanmi Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Bombay Pizza Company LLC, Viral Patel. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********03-2

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hanmi Bank

Defendants

Patel, Viral

Sugar Land, TX 77479-4719

Bombay Pizza Company LLC

4030 Brookfield Run Court

Sugar Land, TX 77479-4719

b/s registered agent Viral Patel

Sugar Land, TX 77479-4719

b/s registered agent and managing member Viral Patel

4030 Brookfield Run Court

Sugar Land, TX 77479-4719

Statutory Documents Section - Citation Unit

P.O. Box 12079

Austin, TX 78711-2079

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PAUL H CROSS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Secretary of State Index # 6: Tex. Sec. of State Certif. of mailing to Bombay Pizza Co., LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 5: Affidavit- Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 4: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-172592: Hanmi Bank: (8.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketCitation: Emailed to Attorney 05/21/2021; Bombay Pizza Company LLC: Served: 05/25/2021; Returned: 05/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's First Amended Petition Index # 3: and Request for Citation Issuance by Secretary of State

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-171359: Hanmi Bank: (262.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Hanmi Bank; Total Financial Assessment: 270.00; Total Payments and Credits: 270.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 262.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCitation: Mailed to Attorney 4/15/2021; Bombay Pizza Company LLC: Unserved ; Patel, Viral: Returned Unserved 06/21/2021; Returned: 06/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Statutory Documents Section -Citations Unit is a litigant

Latest cases where Hanmi Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PAUL H CROSS