This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 05/17/2022 at 08:57:01 (UTC).

Gwendolyn Ramirez vs Irving Holdings, Inc. and Gloria D. Harris

Case Summary

On 10/21/2021 Gwendolyn Ramirez filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Irving Holdings, Inc and Gloria D Harris. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********38-3

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ramirez, Gwendolyn

Defendants

Harris, Gloria D.

Fort Worth, TX 76140

Irving Holdings, Inc.

2515 Irving Blvd

Dallas, TX 75207

a domestic corporation

b/s Registered Agent, Jack Bewley

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard A. Stucky

Defendant Attorney

JOHN HOWELL HOUSE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketDefendant's Original Answer Index # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-178081: Irving Holdings, Inc.: (40.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Defendant Irving Holdings, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment: 40.00; Total Payments and Credits: 40.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketJury Fee Payment Index # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketDefendant's Original Answer Index # 5: and Jury Demand

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 4: Gloria Harris

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 3: (Irving Holdings Inc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-177100: Ramirez, Gwendolyn: (262.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Ramirez, Gwendolyn; Total Financial Assessment: 262.00; Total Payments and Credits: 262.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 262.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketCitation: Mailed to Attorney 10/22/2021; Irving Holdings, Inc.: Served: 11/02/2021; Returned: 11/04/2021; Harris, Gloria D.: Served: 11/06/2021; Returned: 11/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where IRVING HOLDINGS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where A DOMESTIC CORP. B/S ITS REG. AGENT JEFF A WOOLEY AT, is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard A Stucky