This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 09/13/2021 at 08:06:37 (UTC).

Gwendolyn Mayweather and Alvester Jones vs Donald Marshall

Case Summary

On 07/07/2021 Gwendolyn Mayweather and Alvester Jones filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Donald Marshall. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********32-3

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jones, Alvester

Mayweather, Gwendolyn

Defendants

Marshall, Donald

Fort Worth, TX 76111

or wherever Defendant may be found

Fort Worth, TX 76111

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nicholas Alan Howard

Defendant Attorney

Matthew J. Foust

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-175400: Marshall, Donald: (40.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Defendant Marshall, Donald; Total Financial Assessment: 40.00; Total Payments and Credits: 40.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketJury Fee Payment Index # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketVacation Letter Index # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketDefendant's Original Answer Index # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 3: (Donald Marshall)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-173991: Mayweather, Gwendolyn: (258.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Mayweather, Gwendolyn; Total Financial Assessment: 258.00; Total Payments and Credits: 258.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 258.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketCitation: Mailed to Attorney 7/12/2021; Marshall, Donald: Served: 07/30/2021; Returned: 08/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicholas Howard