This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 02/14/2017 at 14:14:11 (UTC).

GUSTAVO CASTANEDA vs. ANGELICA LOPEZ AND ALL OCCUPANTS

Case Summary

On 12/14/2015 GUSTAVO CASTANEDA filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ANGELICA LOPEZ AND ALL OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 5 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is DE LEON, SERGIO L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4226

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

DE LEON, SERGIO L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASTANEDA, GUSTAVO

Fort Worth, TX 76114

Defendant

LOPEZ, ANGELICA

Fort Worth, TX 76106

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2015
  • Dispositions: Judgment for Plaintiff; (Judicial Officer: DE LEON, SERGIO L) ; Judgment of $532.26; Awarded To: GUSTAVO CASTANEDA; Awarded Against: ANGELICA LOPEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION: 011216 WRIT RETD/EXECUTED 011116/BY DELIVERING THE POSSESSION OF THE PREMIES TO THE LANDLORD; LOPEZ, ANGELICA: Served: 01/11/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • Writ of Possession Issued to Constable

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • Writ of Possession Requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • Bond for Appeal Set

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • During the Pendency of Appeal, the Interm Rent Due Is

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • Evict -Judgment / Pltf / Poss/ Past Due Rent / CC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • Hearing: (9:30 AM) () : Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • EVICTION: 121515 CITN RETD/EXECUTED 121515/BY SERVING ADULT MALE/SET FOR TRAIL (123015 @ 9:30AM); LOPEZ, ANGELICA: Served: 12/15/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • Military Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • Original Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # JP5-2016-00023: JOSE CASTANEDA AND TERESA CASTANEDA: (155.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • Transaction Assessment: 155.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # JP5-2015-02909: JOSE CASTANDEDA AND TERESA CASTANEDA: (116.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff CASTANEDA, GUSTAVO; Total Financial Assessment: 271.00; Total Payments and Credits: 271.00; Balance Due as of 02/14/2017: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 116.00

    Read MoreRead Less