Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 02/09/2017 at 20:05:29 (UTC).

Guillermo Perales and Adriana Perales vs Emery Scott Martindale, II a/k/a Scott Martindale

Case Summary

On 12/13/2016 Guillermo Perales and Adriana Perales filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Emery Scott Martindale, II a/k/a Scott Martindale. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********20-2

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Perales, Guillermo

Perales, Adriana

Defendants

a/k/a Scott Martindale

Southlake, TX 76092

Martindale, Emery Scott, II

Southlake, TX 76092

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Israel L. Suster

Defendant Attorney

Andrea S. Loveless

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2017
  • Request for Disclosure Doc ID# 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • Notice Doc ID# 7: of Errata

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • Counter/Cross Action Doc ID# 6: DEFENDANT/COUNTER-PLAINTIFF EMERY SCOTT MARTINDALE S ORIGINAL COUNTER-CLAIM AGAINST PLAINIFF/COUNTER-DEFENDANTS GUILLERMO PERALES AND ADRIANA PERALES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • Defendant's Original Answer Doc ID# 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • Paper Returned Doc ID# 4: Original Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • Citation: Mail to Attorney; Martindale, Emery Scott, II: Served: 12/27/2016; Returned: 12/28/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • Civil Case Information Sheet Doc ID# 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • Original Petition Doc ID# 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • Original Petition Doc ID# 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-117305: Perales, Guillermo: (253.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff Perales, Guillermo; Total Financial Assessment: 253.00; Total Payments and Credits: 253.00; Balance Due as of 02/09/2017: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 253.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-118472: MARTINDALE, EMERY SCOTT: (75.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • Financial Information: Counter Plaintiff MARTINDALE, EMERY SCOTT, II; Total Financial Assessment: 75.00; Total Payments and Credits: 75.00; Balance Due as of 02/09/2017: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Israel L. Suster