This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 09/12/2021 at 06:48:44 (UTC).

Gregory Beutel vs. American Honda Motor Co., Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/25/2021 Gregory Beutel filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against American Honda Motor Co , Inc. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 3 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Brandt, William P. "Bill". The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************5334

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Brandt, William P. "Bill"

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Beutel, Gregory Beutel

Ft Worth, TX 76244

Beutel, Gregory

Ft Worth, TX 76244

Defendants

Honda Motor Corporation

1919 Torrance Blvd

Torrance, CA 90501-2746

SERVE: CT CORPORATION SYSTEMS

818 Seventh Street, Suite 930

Los Angeles, CA 90017

American Honda Motor Co., Inc.

818 Seventh Street, Suite 930

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

ABIGAIL A MATHEWS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketHearing: (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Brandt, William P. "Bill")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketCANCELED: Non-Jury Trial; (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Brandt, William P. "Bill") ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing: ON DISCOVERY ON 10-4-21 @ 9:30AM IN SOUTHLAKE. NON-JURY TRIAL CANCELED; JLM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketProposed Order: Proposed Order on Motion for Pre-Trial Discovery; JLM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketMotion for Leave/Permission for Discovery Filed: JLM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up/3 Months; (9:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Non-Jury Trial: ON 9-15-21 @ 9:00AM IN SOUTHLAKE. JLM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up/3 Months; (9:00 AM) () ; Other; CHECK TO SEE IF CASE HAS SETTLED; JLM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketCANCELED: To Be Set for Trial; (1:00 PM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketAnswer Filed: American Honda Motor Co. Inc.'s Amended Answer to Plaintiff s Petition. General Denial. Demands Jury but didn't pay fee. Set for Trial. MB

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketAlias Citation Issued: (FIRST ALIAS) WITH CORRECTED AGENT - CT CORPORATION SYSTEM AND EMAILED TO PLTF FOR OUT OF STATE SERVICE. MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP3-2021-02608: Beutel, Gregory Beutel: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Beutel, Gregory; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketAlias Citation Requested: BY PLTF VIA EMAIL. CORRECTED ADDRESS WITH REGISTERED AGENT FOR DEFN UPDATED. MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketEmailed: PETITION, CITATION AND OUT OF STATE LETTER TO PLTF FOR SERVICE. MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketLetter Issued: TO PLTF FOR OUT OF STATE SERVICE. MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketCITATION: American Honda Motor Co., Inc.: Served: 06/04/2021; Returned: 06/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued: AND EMAILED TO PLTF FOR OUT OF STATE SERVICE. MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Guide and File - Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SERVE - CT CORPORATION SYSTEM is a litigant

Latest cases where HONDA MOTOR COMPANY LTD. is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO. INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ABIGAIL A MATHEWS