This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 02/04/2021 at 15:09:56 (UTC).

Great Southern Bank vs Timothy M Hendon

Case Summary

On 07/20/2020 Great Southern Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Timothy M Hendon. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********67-3

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Great Southern Bank

Defendant

Hendon, Timothy M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael J Adams

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketPaper Returned Index #4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketDefendant's Original Answer Index #3: Pro Se

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-163157: Great Southern Bank: (258.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Great Southern Bank; Total Financial Assessment: 258.00; Total Payments and Credits: 258.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 258.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketCitation: Mailed to Attorney Office 07/21/2020; Hendon, Timothy M: Served: 09/18/2020; Returned: 10/20/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index #2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index #1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less