This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 02/19/2020 at 09:07:21 (UTC).

Great Southern Bank vs EECU Credit Union

Case Summary

On 10/02/2019 Great Southern Bank filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against EECU Credit Union. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Rymell, Jennifer. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********93-2

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Rymell, Jennifer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Great Southern Bank

Defendants

B/S Reg., Agent, David F. Shurtz

EECU Credit Union b/s Registered Agent, David F. Shurtz

EECU Credit Union

B/S Reg. Agent, David F. Shurtz

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James W. King

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketNotice of Judgment or Order Signed Doc ID#7: Copy electronically served and/or mailed to party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketDispositions: Order Dismissal Without Prejudice; (Judicial Officer: Rymell, Jennifer)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal Without Prejudice Doc ID#6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketJudge Docket Entry: Order of Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketLetter Doc ID#5: RE: Notice of Nonsuit of Garnishment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketNotice of Non-Suit Doc ID#4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketNotice: mailed to atty 10/04; Lane, Randall Scott: Unserved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketWrit of Garnishment: mailed to attorney 10/04; EECU Credit Union: Served: 10/15/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-153213: Great Southern Bank: (253.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Great Southern Bank; Total Financial Assessment: 253.00; Total Payments and Credits: 253.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 253.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketLetter Doc ID#3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition Doc ID#2: Application for Postjudgment Writ of Garnishment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Post Garnishment Doc ID#1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less