This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 08/16/2023 at 13:34:55 (UTC).

GRAHAM MORTGAGE CORPORATION vs. MERCER LACY, LLC AND ALL OCCUPANTS

Case Summary

On 04/21/2017 GRAHAM MORTGAGE CORPORATION filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MERCER LACY, LLC AND ALL OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Curnutt, Mary Tom. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************9112

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Curnutt, Mary Tom

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GRAHAM MORTGAGE CORPORATION

Defendant

MERCER LACY, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Y Lin

Defendant Attorney

ASHLEY T PARRISH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2017
  • DocketDispositions: Dismissed by Plaintiff or Nonsuited; (Judicial Officer: Curnutt, Mary Tom)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • DocketMotion for Non-Suit Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial: (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Curnutt, Mary Tom)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • DocketComments: REC'D LETTER FROM PLTF ATTY RE: CASE SETTLED REMOVE FROM DOCKET & NON-SUIT TO FOLLOW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • DocketComments: NOTIFIED PLTF ATTY BY VOICEMAIL & DEFN ATTY OVER PHONE OF CASE IS ON FOR 7/21/17 @ 9:00 AS A REMINDER CALL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • DocketCANCELED: Non-Jury Trial; (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Curnutt, Mary Tom) ; Continuance Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • DocketOrder Granting Motion for Continuance Entered: MAILED BOTH PARTIES ORDER AND NEW COURT DATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • DocketAgreed Motion for Continuance Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • DocketNotice of Appearance Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • DocketComments: DEFN ATTY SIGNED AGREED MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE, THEREFORE, DEFN IS BEFORE TH COURT. NOTIFIED BOTH ATTYS OF HEARING BY VOPICEMAIL AND LETTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • DocketComments: PLTF ATTY CALLED AND ADVISED TO SET CASE FOR COURT. HE WAS TOLD WE COULD NOT SET FOR COURT AS DEFN HAD NOT BEEN SERVED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • DocketComments: LEFT MSG W/LINDA @ PLTF ATTY OFC RE: STATUS OF CASE, NEEDED TO BE SET FOR COURT OR DISMISSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • DocketCitation Returned Unexecuted - Bad Address for Party: PLTF ATTY WAS ADVISED OF BAD ADDRESS AND HE STATES PARTIES ARE IN DISCUSSION RE SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • DocketCANCELED: Non-Jury Trial; (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Curnutt, Mary Tom) ; Continuance Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • DocketOrder Granting Motion for Continuance Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • DocketAgreed Motion for Continuance Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • FinancialCounter Payment: Receipt # JP2-2017-01543: CARRINGTON COLEMAN: (41.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff GRAHAM MORTGAGE CORPORATION; Total Financial Assessment: 41.00; Total Payments and Credits: 41.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 116.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • DocketEVICTION: MERCER LACY, LLC: Returned Unserved 05/12/2017; Returned: 05/12/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less