Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 02/28/2021 at 00:43:37 (UTC).

GRACE RICO vs BRIDGEWAY HEALTH SERVICES, INC., BRIDGEWAY HEALTH SERVICES, BRIDGEWAY HEALTHCARE, INC., BRIDGEWAY HEALTHCARE

Case Summary

On 03/29/2019 GRACE RICO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BRIDGEWAY HEALTH SERVICES, INC , BRIDGEWAY HEALTH SERVICES, BRIDGEWAY HEALTHCARE, INC , BRIDGEWAY HEALTHCARE. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Pierson, Don. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********24-1

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Pierson, Don

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RICO, GRACE

Defendants

BRIDGEWAY HEALTHCARE, INC.

3880 Hulen Street, Suite 670

Fort Worth, TX 76107

B/s It's Manager

Fort Worth, TX 76107

B/s registered agent, CT Corporation System

1999 Bryan Street, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

BRIDGEWAY HEALTHCARE

BRIDGEWAY HEALTH SERVICES, INC.

1999 Bryan Street, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

BRIDGEWAY HEALTH SERVICES

C/O Chance Smith

Fort Worth, TX 76102

DOUGLAS, THOMAS & SMITH REAL ESTATE II, LLC

1501 Summit Avenue, #250

Fort Worth, TX 76102

DOUGLAS, THOMAS & SMITH REAL ESTATE, LLC

1501 Summit Avenue, # 250

Fort Worth, TX 76102

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

J. Patrick Gallagher

Jackson Davis

Defendant Attorneys

DAVID A JOHNSON

MIKE H BASSETT

J MARK HANSEN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCANCELED: Week of Jury Trial Scheduling Only (Disregard Start Time); (7:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerPierson, Don) ; Dismissed; 09/21/2020; Reset by Court to 03/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketCertified Deposition of Custody Records Index #82: RE: Texas Healthcare, PPC/Stephanie Hill- Medical Records & Diagnostic Imaging

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketCertified Deposition of Custody Records Index #81: RE: Texas Healthcare PLLC Including Dr. Terrence Walker Medical Records

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Deposition Index #80: by oral depostion of Grace Rico

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Deposition Index #79: by Written Questions for AllCare Physicians Group- Billing Records

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Judgment or Order Signed Index #78: Emailed to all atty's

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketDispositions: Order of Dismissal With Prejudice; (Judicial Officer: Pierson, Don)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal With Prejudice Index #77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketAgreed Motion to Dismiss Index #76

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Judgment or Order Signed Index #74: Emailed and or mailed to all parties

    Read MoreRead Less
80 More Docket Entries
  • 04/30/2019
  • DocketJury Fee Payment Index #7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • DocketJury Demand Index #6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketDefendant's Original Answer W/Req Disclosure Index #5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-145416: RICO, GRACE: (434.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff RICO, GRACE; Total Financial Assessment: 452.00; Total Payments and Credits: 452.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 434.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • DocketCitation by Certified Mail Index #4:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • DocketCitation by Certified Mail Index #3:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • DocketCitation: Certified Mail, ****QC by vr, 01-22-2020.; BRIDGEWAY HEALTH SERVICES, INC.: Unserved ; BRIDGEWAY HEALTHCARE, INC.: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index #2: and Request for Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index #1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MIKE H BASSETT

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVID A JOHNSON

Latest cases represented by Lawyer J MARK HANSEN