Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 06/09/2017 at 10:31:12 (UTC).

GLEN ROSE PARK DBA/RON FRANCO DBA GLEN ROSE PARK vs. WOODRINA WILLIAMS AND ALL OCCUPANTS

Case Summary

On 05/16/2017 GLEN ROSE PARK DBA/RON FRANCO DBA GLEN ROSE PARK filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against WOODRINA WILLIAMS AND ALL OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 3 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Casey, Russell B. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************7698

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 3

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Casey, Russell B

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GLEN ROSE PARK DBA/RON FRANCO

Austin, TX 78741

GLEN ROSE PARK DBA/RON FRANCO DBA GLEN ROSE PARK

Austin, TX 78741

Defendant

WILLIAMS, WOODRINA

Hurst, TX 76053

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2017
  • Dispositions: Dismissed by Plaintiff or Nonsuited; (Judicial Officer: Casey, Russell B.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • CANCELED: Non-Jury Trial; (9:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerCasey, Russell B.) ; Non-Suit/Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice on Plaintiff's Motion: REC'D BEFORE TRIAL LETTER WAS SENT OUT, SO NO TRIAL LETTER WAS MAILED. DISMISSAL MAILED OUT TO ALL PARTIES. ETN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • Motion To Dismiss Filed by Plaintiff: VIA FAX BY PLTF. PRESENTING TO JUDGE. ETN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • Trial letter mailed: CASE RESET TO 6/7/17 @ 9AM (HURST), NOTICE MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. ETN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • Comments: AT TIME OF TRIAL, PLTF APPEARED AND DEFN ALSO APPEARED. JUDGE CONTINUED CASE TO JUNE 7TH AT 9:00AM. ETN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial: (9:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerCasey, Russell B.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • Citation Returned: BY C03/ SERVED ON 5/19/17 BY ALTERNATE SERVICE AT 799 E PECAN ST APT #232 HURST, TX 76053. ETN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • Order Approving Alternate Service Entered: JUDGE APPROVED AND SIGNED, RETURNED TO CO3 FOR SERVICE /JL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • Affidavit for Alternate Service Filed: BY CO3 FOR SERVICE VIA RULE 510; PRESENTED TO JUDGE /JL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • EVICTION: WILLIAMS, WOODRINA: Served: 05/19/2017; Returned: 05/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • Citation Issued and Sent to C03 for Service: ETN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • Email Consent by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • Military Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • Original Petition Filed (OCA Opening): HURST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # JP3-2017-02067: LAKEDRA SWAIN: (116.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff GLEN ROSE PARK DBA/RON FRANCO DBA GLEN ROSE PARK; Total Financial Assessment: 116.00; Total Payments and Credits: 116.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 116.00

    Read MoreRead Less