Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 08/24/2017 at 18:36:41 (UTC).

GLEN ROSE PARK DBA/RON FRANCO DBA GLEN ROSE PARK vs. EUGENIA CARNELL AND ALL OCCUPANTS

Case Summary

On 07/20/2017 GLEN ROSE PARK DBA/RON FRANCO DBA GLEN ROSE PARK filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against EUGENIA CARNELL AND ALL OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 3 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Casey, Russell B. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8231

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 3

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Casey, Russell B

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GLEN ROSE PARK DBA/RON FRANCO DBA GLEN ROSE PARK

Austin, TX 78752

Defendant

CARNELL, EUGENIA

Hurst, TX 76053

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2017
  • Dispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Casey, Russell B.) ; Judgment of $861.36; Awarded To: GLEN ROSE PARK DBA/RON FRANCO DBA GLEN ROSE PARK; Awarded Against: EUGENIA CARNELL; Comment: RET OF PREM + $861.36 BR + CC @ 5% INT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • Writ of Possession Signed and Returned to Constable: SENT TO CO3 FOR SERVICE. KNS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION: CARNELL, EUGENIA: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • Writ of Possession Issued to Constable: PRESENTED TO JUDGE. KNS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • Writ of Possession Requested: IN PERSON BY PLTF. FEES PAID.NUMBER ADDED ON WRIT IS 817-268-8601. ETN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • Bond for Appeal Set: ES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • Default Notice Mailed: TO DEFN WITH JGNT ES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • Evict - Default Judgment for Possession, Past Due Rent, & CC: PRO SE PLTF APPEARED; DEFN DID NOT APPEAR; DEFAULT JGNT FOR PLTF FOR RET OF PREM + $861.36 BR + CC @ 5% INT; MAILED TO ALL PARTIES ES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial: (9:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerCasey, Russell B.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • Citation Returned: SERVED BY ATTACHING TO DOOR BY RULE 510 ON 7/26/17 @ 3:26 PM TO EUGENIA CARNELL AT 781 E. PECAN ST APT 156, HURST, TX 76053 ES

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/26/2017
  • Affidavit for Alternate Service Filed: BY C03 FOR SRVC BY RULE 510; PRESENTED TO JUDGE ES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • EVICTION: CARNELL, EUGENIA: Served: 07/26/2017; Returned: 07/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • Citation Issued and Sent to C03 for Service:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • Email Consent by Plaintiff: ES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • Military Affidavit Filed: ES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • Original Petition Filed (OCA Opening): HURST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # JP3-2017-03593: LAKEDRA SWAIN: (155.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • Transaction Assessment: 155.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # JP3-2017-03114: LAKEDRA SWAIN: (116.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff GLEN ROSE PARK DBA/RON FRANCO DBA GLEN ROSE PARK; Total Financial Assessment: 271.00; Total Payments and Credits: 271.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 116.00

    Read MoreRead Less