Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/08/2021 at 08:04:54 (UTC).

Galaxy International Purchasing, LLC vs Martha Elkins

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 Galaxy International Purchasing, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Martha Elkins. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********67-1

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Galaxy International Purchasing, LLC

4730 South Ft Apache Rd Ste 300

Las Vegas, NV 89147-7947

Defendants

or at such other place as the Defendant may be found

Arlington, TX 76016-1425

Elkins, Martha

Arlington, TX 76016-1425

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

R. Kyle Ball

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketPaper Returned Index #4: (Martha Elkins)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-170062: Galaxy International Purchasing, LLC: (258.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Galaxy International Purchasing, LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 258.00; Total Payments and Credits: 258.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 258.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCitation: ABC Legal basket - picked up 03/04; Elkins, Martha: Served: 03/08/2021; Returned: 03/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketLetter Index #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index #1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GALAXY INTERNATIONAL PURCHASING, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer R. Kyle Ball