Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 07/20/2021 at 19:15:32 (UTC).

GALAXY INTERNATIONAL PURCHASING, LLC vs. EYAD ABUOLWAN

Case Summary

On 06/01/2021 GALAXY INTERNATIONAL PURCHASING, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against EYAD ABUOLWAN. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 7 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************2865

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 7

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GALAXY INTERNATIONAL PURCHASING, LLC

15660 Dallas Pkwy Ste 350

Dallas, TX 75248

Defendant

ABUOLWAN, EYAD

Grand Prairie, TX 75054-5501

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TaLisa Karene Lowery

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up/ 60 Day; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketClerk Follow up/ Answer Due: (8:00 AM) ()

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketAnswer Due On

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketAffidavit/Proof of Service Filed: Return of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketCITATION: ABUOLWAN, EYAD: Served: 06/19/2021; Returned: 06/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued: EMAILED TO REQUESTOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP7-2021-04531: GALAXY INTERNATIONAL PURCHASING, LLC: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff GALAXY INTERNATIONAL PURCHASING, LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: RSIEHcourts@abclegal.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GALAXY INTERNATIONAL PURCHASING, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TaLisa Karene Lowery