This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 09/30/2021 at 19:41:59 (UTC).

Galaxy International Purchasing, LLC vs. Brian Rawlston,Yolanda Rawlston

Case Summary

On 07/13/2021 Galaxy International Purchasing, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Brian Rawlston,Yolanda Rawlston. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 6 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Charbonnet, Jason M. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************5418

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Charbonnet, Jason M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Galaxy International Purchasing, LLC

15660 N Dallas Parkway Suite 350

Dallas, TX 75248

Defendants

Rawlston, Brian

Fort Worth, TX 76123-1491

Rawlston, Yolanda

Fort Worth, TX 76123-1491

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brandi Marie Addison

Defendant Attorney

John Gannon Helstowski

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketClerk Follow Up/3 Months: (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Charbonnet, Jason M) : 09/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketOrder Granting Motion for Leave/Request for Discovery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketEmailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketMotion Filed: Defendant's Motion for PreTrial Discovery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketAnswer Filed: Defendant's Original Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: Return of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketEmailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketOrder Approving Alternate Service Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketMotion Filed: ALT SERV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: Return of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketProposed Order: ALT SERV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketMotion Filed: ALT SERV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP6-2021-04952: Galaxy International Purchasing, LLC: (48.50)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Galaxy International Purchasing, LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 48.50; Total Payments and Credits: 48.50; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 48.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketEmailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketCITATION: Rawlston, Brian: Served: 07/24/2021; Returned: 07/26/2021; Rawlston, Yolanda: Served: 07/30/2021; Returned: 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GALAXY INTERNATIONAL PURCHASING, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brandi Marie Addison