Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 07/30/2021 at 08:16:07 (UTC).

Gabrielle Cook and Jabarri Robinson, Sr. Individually and as Next Friends of J.R., a Minor vs Arnold Anchondo, Jr., Andrew Velazquez Torres, and Mary Anchondo

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 Gabrielle Cook and Jabarri Robinson, Sr Individually and as Next Friends of J R , a Minor filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Arnold Anchondo, Jr , Andrew Velazquez Torres, and Mary Anchondo. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********45-3

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Robinson, Jabarri, SR

Cook, Gabrielle

Defendants

Anchondo, Mary

Velazquez Torres, Andrew

Anchondo, Arnold, JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph R. Morrison

Defendant Attorney

KELLY M CRAIN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Appearance of Counsel Index # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2021
  • DocketOrder of Court Appointing Position (MAFR) Index # 4: ***Enter information on Appointments Tab - Monthly Appointments and Fees Report***-Electronically served to Party's attorney and/or mailed to all pro-se parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketDefendant's Original Answer Index # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-171000: Anchondo, Arnold: (254.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Defendant Anchondo, Arnold, JR; Total Financial Assessment: 254.00; Total Payments and Credits: 254.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 254.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 2: Friendly Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kelly M Crain