This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 03/18/2017 at 19:00:08 (UTC).

FW-EASTLAND HOUSING PARTNERS vs. ALEXANDREA TIMMS AND ALL OCCUPANTS

Case Summary

On 11/16/2015 FW-EASTLAND HOUSING PARTNERS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ALEXANDREA TIMMS AND ALL OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 8 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Woodard, Lisa R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4057

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Woodard, Lisa R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FW-EASTLAND HOUSING PARTNERS

Defendant

TIMMS, ALEXANDREA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2015
  • DocketDispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Woodard, Lisa R) ; Judgment of $861.29; Awarded To: FW-EASTLAND HOUSING PARTNERS; Awarded Against: ALEXANDREA TIMMS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • DocketComments: REAL PROPERTY RET'D TO RIGHTFUL OWNER BTW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION: TIMMS, ALEXANDREA: Served: 01/06/2016; Returned: 01/07/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • DocketWrit of Possession Requested: BY PLTF * KEJ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • DocketEvict - Default Judgment for Poss, & Past Due Rent: OF $861.29 + CC - BTW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • DocketDefault Notice Mailed: BTW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • DocketHearing: (8:30 AM) (Judicial OfficerWoodard, Lisa R) : Result: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • DocketComments: RET EXECUTED VIA RULE 510.4C;COURT DATE 12/03/15 AT 8:30AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • DocketEVICTION: TIMMS, ALEXANDREA: Served: 11/23/2015; Returned: 11/24/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • DocketRequest For Alternate Service Filed and Approved: ..RDK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • DocketEVICTION: TIMMS, ALEXANDREA: Returned Unserved 11/20/2015; Returned: 11/20/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening): ISSUED TO C08..RDK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • DocketCounter Payment: Receipt # JP8-2015-04570: FW-EASTLAND HOUSING PARTNERS: (155.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • DocketTransaction Assessment: 155.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • DocketCounter Payment: Receipt # JP8-2015-04109: FW-EASTLAND HOUSING PARTNERS: (116.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • DocketFinancial Information: Plaintiff FW-EASTLAND HOUSING PARTNERS; Total Financial Assessment: 271.00; Total Payments and Credits: 271.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 116.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FW- EASTLAND HOUSING PARTNERS is a litigant