This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 08/28/2020 at 14:04:34 (UTC).

Frazier Texas Properties/ Richard Frazier vs Shannon McTaggert and All Occupants

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Frazier Texas Properties/ Richard Frazier filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Shannon McTaggert and All Occupants. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Pierson, Don. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********07-1

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Pierson, Don

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Frazier Texas Properties/ Richard Frazier

3000 Race Street, Suite 132

Fort Worth, TX 76111

Defendants

McTaggert, Shannon

Arlington, TX 76013

and All Occupants

Arlington, TX 76013

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gregory A. Whittmore

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2020
  • FinancialInability to Pay Court Cost: 254.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketReturned Mail Index #11: Return to Sender/Vacant/Unable to Forward - Notice of Judgment or Order - QC ST 4/8/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketNotice of Judgment or Order Signed Index #10: electronically served to Party's attorney and/or mailed to all pro-se parties.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketDispositions: Order of Non Suit; (Judicial Officer: Pierson, Don)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketOrder for Non-Suit Index #9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketNotice of Non-Suit Index #8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Defendant McTaggert, Shannon; Total Financial Assessment: 0.00; Total Payments and Credits: 0.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 254.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketLetter to Pauper Pro Bono Option Index #7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketLetter Notifying Parties of Case Filing Index #6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketJP Transcript of Judgment Index #5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketAffidavit of Inability to Pay Index #4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketJP Judgment Index #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketJP Request Source of Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketJP Sworn Complaint for Eviction Index #2:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOCA Appeal Index #1

    Read MoreRead Less