Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 02/04/2021 at 13:43:31 (UTC).

Floors, LLC vs Robert Michael McKelvain d/b/a Riley Signature Homes, LLC, and Crystal Lynette McKelvain

Case Summary

On 07/09/2020 Floors, LLC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Robert Michael McKelvain d/b/a Riley Signature Homes, LLC, and Crystal Lynette McKelvain. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********86-1

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Floors, LLC

Defendants

McKelvain, Robert Michael

Fort Worth, TX 76108

McKelvain, Crystal Lynette

Fort Worth, TX 76108

d/b/a Riley Signature Homes, LLC

4420 La Cantera Court Or Wherever He May Be Found

Fort Worth, TX 76108

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bruce L. Mansfield

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Judgment or Order Signed Index #8: Electronically Served and/or mailed to all attorneys and Pro Se Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketOrder on Abate Index #9: or Remove it from the Court's Active Docket- GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketMotion to Abate Index #7: Case or Remove it from the Court's Active Docket

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketPaper Returned Index #6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketPaper Returned Index #5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-162995: Floors, LLC: (8.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketCitation: mailed to atty 07/14/2020; McKelvain, Robert Michael: Served: 07/20/2020; Returned: 07/21/2020; McKelvain, Crystal Lynette: Served: 07/20/2020; Returned: 07/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketLetter Index #4: Re: Requesting Issuance of Citations

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's First Amended Petition Index #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-162888: Floors, LLC: (254.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Floors, LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 262.00; Total Payments and Credits: 262.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 254.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index #2: Suit on Sworn Account and Request for Disclosures

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index #1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Floors, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bruce L. Mansfield