Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 03/22/2021 at 09:04:01 (UTC).

Floors, LLC vs Darsona Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a Alliance Homes, DFW, Darwish Mohammed Otrok and Osama Mohamed Elmhishi

Case Summary

On 06/25/2020 Floors, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Darsona Enterprises, Inc d/b/a Alliance Homes, DFW, Darwish Mohammed Otrok and Osama Mohamed Elmhishi. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Pierson, Don. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********07-1

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Pierson, Don

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Floors, LLC

Defendants

Elmhishi, Osama Mohamed

Fort Worth, TX 76118

Or wherever he may be found

Grapevine, TX 76051

Otrok, Darwish Mohammed

Grapevine, TX 76051

B/S Registered Darwish Mohammed Otrok

Grapevine, TX 76051

Darsona Enterprises, Inc.

2805 Crestridge Court

Grapevine, TX 76051

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bruce L. Mansfield

Defendant Attorney

Michael Brinkley

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketWeek of NonJury Trial Scheduling Only (Disregard Start Time): (7:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerPierson, Don)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketLetter Requesting Setting for Trial Index #8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketDefendant's Original Answer Index #7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketPaper Returned Index #6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketPaper Returned Index #5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketPaper Returned Index #4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-162511: Floors, LLC: (266.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Floors, LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 266.00; Total Payments and Credits: 266.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 266.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketCitation: Mailed to Attorney Office 06/26/2020; Darsona Enterprises, Inc.: Served: 06/30/2020; Returned: 07/01/2020; Otrok, Darwish Mohammed: Served: 06/30/2020; Returned: 07/01/2020; Elmhishi, Osama Mohamed: Served: 06/30/2020; Returned: 07/01/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketLetter Index #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index #2: Original Petition and Request for Disclosures

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index #1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Floors, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bruce L. Mansfield