Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 02/01/2021 at 18:05:42 (UTC).

FLOORS, LLC D/B/A ARTISAN DESIGN GROUP vs. KYLE RANCE

Case Summary

On 01/23/2020 FLOORS, LLC D/B/A ARTISAN DESIGN GROUP filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KYLE RANCE. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 3 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Brandt, William P. "Bill". The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************1854

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 3

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Brandt, William P. "Bill"

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FLOORS, LLC D/B/A ARTISAN DESIGN GROUP

1550 Norwood Drive, Suite 107

Hurst, TX 76054

c/o Mansfield & Mansfield PC

1550 Norwood Drive, Suite 107

Hurst, TX 76054

Defendant

RANCE, KYLE

Keller, TX 76244

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorney

Bruce L. Mansfield

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketDispositions: Dismissed by Plaintiff or Nonsuited; (Judicial Officer: Brandt, William P. "Bill")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketOrder of Non-Suit Without Prejudice Entered: JUDGE APPROVED AND SIGNED. COPY EMAILED TO PLTF'S ATTY AND MAILED TO DEFN. KD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketMotion for Non-Suit Filed: AMENDED. VIA E-FILE BY PLTF'S ATTY. PRESENTED TO JUDGE. KD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketNotice: Plaintiff's Notice of Non-Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketClerk Follow Up: (8:00 AM) ()

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketClerk Follow Up: (8:00 AM) ()

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2020
  • DocketCITATION: RANCE, KYLE: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2020
  • DocketCitation Issued: AND SENT TO PPS FOR SERVICE. KD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketDefendant Contacted Court: BY PHONE THAT DEFN HAS GOTTEN LETTERS HE'S BEING SUED. TOLD DEFN CITATION HAS NOT BEEN ISSUED YET. GAVE DEFN PH NUMBER FOR PLTF ATTY TO CONTACT. MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP3-2020-00481: RANCE, KYLE: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Defendant RANCE, KYLE; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: LETTER TO COURT RE ISSUE CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening): MANSFIELD

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Floors, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bruce L. Mansfield