This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 01/18/2023 at 18:22:08 (UTC).

Flagship Credit Acceptance, LLC vs Eleanor Jacks

Case Summary

On 10/21/2022 Flagship Credit Acceptance, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Eleanor Jacks. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court at Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Hrabal, Mike. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********97-3

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Hrabal, Mike

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Flagship Credit Acceptance, LLC

5400 Legacy Drive

Plano, TX 75024

Defendant

Jacks, Eleanor

Fort Worth, TX 76134

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeremiah B. Hayes

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketRule 239a Notice of Default Judgment Index # 16: Electronically served to Party's attorney and/or mailed to all pro-se parties

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketDispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Hrabal, Mike)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketJudgment - Default Index # 15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketJudge Docket Entry: DJ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Last Known Address Index # 14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketAffidavit Index # 13: in Support of Motion for Default Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment Index # 12

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 11: Writ of Sequestration- Eleanor Jacks

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 10: Original Citation-Eleanor Jacks

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-187251: Flagship Credit Acceptance, LLC: (268.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketLetter Index # 9: Issuance of Writ Sequestration, Citation and Copies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Judgment or Order Signed Index # 6: Electronically served to Party's attorney and/or mailed to all pro-se parties

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketOrder for Sequestration Index # 5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (137.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-186832: Flagship Credit Acceptance, LLC: (213.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Flagship Credit Acceptance, LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 618.00; Total Payments and Credits: 618.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 350.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketAffidavit Index # 4: Affidavit in Support of Application for Sequestration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketApplication Index # 3: Application for Writ of Sequestration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FLAGSHIP CREDIT ACCEPTANCE LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAYES, JEREMIAH B