This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 06/17/2019 at 08:13:45 (UTC).

Five Star Ford of Texas Ltd. vs Texas Department of Motor Vehicles

Case Summary

On 06/26/2018 Five Star Ford of Texas Ltd filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against Texas Department of Motor Vehicles. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Pierson, Don. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********41-1

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Pierson, Don

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Five Star Ford of Texas Ltd.

6618 Ne Loop 820

North Richland Hills, TX 76180

Defendant

Texas Department of Motor Vehicles

4000 Jackson, Building 1

Austin, TX 78731

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEREK D ROLLINS

Defendant Attorney

Sarah Irwin Swanson

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2018
  • Dispositions: Final Judgment After non Jury Trial; (Judicial Officer: Pierson, Don)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Request: for copy of judgment/Mailed to Atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • Notice of Judgment or Order Signed Doc ID#7: eServe

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Judgment for Plaintiff Doc ID#6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • Defendant's Original Answer Doc ID#5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • Civil Docket Doc ID#4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • Citation: citn mld to aty; Texas Department of Motor Vehicles: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • Civil Case Information Sheet Doc ID#3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • Original Petition Doc ID#2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • Original Petition Doc ID#1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-142503: Five Star Ford of Texas Ltd.: (3.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Transaction Assessment: 3.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-134598: Five Star Ford of Texas Ltd.: (258.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff Five Star Ford of Texas Ltd.; Total Financial Assessment: 261.00; Total Payments and Credits: 261.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 258.00

    Read MoreRead Less