Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/21/2021 at 08:02:52 (UTC).

First Source Millworks, Inc. d/b/a First Source Cabinet Doors vs Believe, Achieve, and Conquer, LLC d/b/a BAC

Case Summary

On 03/24/2021 First Source Millworks, Inc d/b/a First Source Cabinet Doors filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Believe, Achieve, and Conquer, LLC d/b/a BAC. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********84-2

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

d/b/a First Source Cabinet Doors

First Source Millworks, Inc.

Defendants

Believe, Achieve, and Conquer, LLC

7935 Emerald Bluff Court

Houston, TX 77095

or wherever he may be found

Houston, TX 77095

d/b/a BAC

7935 Emerald Bluff Court

Houston, TX 77095

b/s registered agent, Michael A. Foust

Houston, TX 77095

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Craig A. Bernstein

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketPaper Returned Index #4: (Believe Achieve and Conquer LLC d/b/a BAC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-170895: First Source Millworks, Inc.: (258.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff First Source Millworks, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment: 258.00; Total Payments and Credits: 258.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 258.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketCitation: Mailed to attorney office 03/26/2021; Believe, Achieve, and Conquer, LLC: Served: 04/01/2021; Returned: 04/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketLetter Index #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index #2: Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index #1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Craig A. Bernstein