Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 06/02/2017 at 12:23:34 (UTC).

Finzer Roller, Inc. vs Environmental Machines & Service, L.L.C.

Case Summary

On 01/31/2017 Finzer Roller, Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Environmental Machines Service, L L C. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Hrabal, Mike. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********20-3

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Hrabal, Mike

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Finzer Roller, Inc.

Defendants

b/s Chandra C. Webb, its Registered Agent

Houston, TX 77032

Environmental Machines & Service, L.L.C.

18718 Arlan Lake Dr

Spring, TX 77388

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kimberly A. Guest

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2017
  • Dispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Hrabal, Mike)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • Motion for Turnover: (1:00 PM) (Judicial OfficerHrabal, Mike)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • Notice of Hearing / Trial Doc ID#11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • Application Doc ID#10: APPLICTl0N FUR TURNUVER AND RECEIVERSHIP IN AID OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • Returned Mail Doc ID#9: Changed of Address. Mailed out again.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • Civil Docket Doc ID#8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • Judgment - Default Doc ID#7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • Motion for Default Judgment Doc ID#6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • Paper Returned Doc ID#5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • Citation: Mail to Attorney; Environmental Machines & Service, L.L.C.: Served: 03/16/2017; Returned: 03/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Civil Case Information Sheet Doc ID#4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Letter Doc ID#3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Original Petition Doc ID#2: with Requests for Disclosures and Requests for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Original Petition Doc ID#1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-118763: Finzer Roller, Inc.: (253.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff Finzer Roller, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment: 253.00; Total Payments and Credits: 253.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 253.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kimberly A. Guest