Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 03/02/2017 at 02:56:26 (UTC).

FIA CARD SERVICES NA vs. TINA B OLAFUSI

Case Summary

On 02/08/2012 FIA CARD SERVICES NA filed an Other lawsuit against TINA B OLAFUSI. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 7 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Hayes, Matt. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************1375

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 7

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Hayes, Matt

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIA CARD SERVICES NA

Defendant

OLAFUSI, TINA B

Arlington, TX 76002

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael J Adams

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2012
  • Dispositions: Summary Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Hayes, Matt) ; Judgment of $6,196.70; Awarded To: FIA CARD SERVICES NA; Awarded Against: TINA OLAFUSI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2012
  • Notice of Change of Address Filed: BY PLTF ATTY. JAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2012
  • Order for Summary Judgment Entered: (Judicial Officer: Hayes, Matt ) : FOR PLTF $6196.70 PLUS CC AND INT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2012
  • Motions Hearing: (3:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Hayes, Matt) : Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2012
  • CANCELED: Non-Jury Trial; (1:15 PM) (Judicial Officer Hayes, Matt) ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2012
  • Comments: PER JUDGE SET FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2012
  • Defendant Contacted Court: @ WINDOW AND BROUGHT IN ADDITIONAL PAPERWORK THAT SHE WANTED FILED WITH THE CASE/ MF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2012
  • Motion for Summary Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Comments: (Judicial Officer: Hayes, Matt ) : PER JUDGE SET FOR TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Pre-Trial Hearing: (9:15 AM) (Judicial Officer Hayes, Matt) : Result: Set for Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 04/16/2012
  • Answer Filed: CERT OF SVC ISSUED W/INSTR. TH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2012
  • Certificate of Service Filed: BY DEFN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2012
  • Answer Filed: BY DFDT AND PUT IN ELSA'S INBOX JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2012
  • Process Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added): $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2012
  • Answer Due On

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2012
  • Military Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2012
  • CITATION: OLAFUSI, TINA B: Served: 03/08/2012; Returned: 03/12/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2012
  • Original Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2012
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # JP7-2012-00964: ADAMS, MICHAEL J.: (31.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2012
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff FIA CARD SERVICES NA; Total Financial Assessment: 31.00; Total Payments and Credits: 31.00; Balance Due as of 03/01/2017: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 31.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fia Card Services, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael J. Adams