This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 07/03/2022 at 08:35:28 (UTC).

Felipe Juarez vs Yes Financial Services, L.L.C.

Case Summary

On 05/16/2022 Felipe Juarez filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Yes Financial Services, L L C. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Pierson, Don. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********13-1

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Pierson, Don

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Juarez, Felipe

Defendants

Yes Financial Services, L.L.C.

211 E. 7Th Street, Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

a Foreign Limited Liability Company

b/s Registered Agent, Corporation Service Company

dba CSC - Lawyers Incorporating Service Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James R. Baudhuin

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Judgment or Order Signed Index # 6: Electronically Served to Party's Attorney and/or Mailed to all Pro-Se Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketDispositions: Order of Non Suit; (Judicial Officer: Pierson, Don)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketOrder for Non-Suit Index # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 4: Original Citation on Yes Financial Services LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (137.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-182132: Juarez, Felipe: (221.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Juarez, Felipe; Total Financial Assessment: 358.00; Total Payments and Credits: 358.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 358.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketCitation: Hold for Pick-up for Attorney; Yes Financial Services, L.L.C.: Served: 05/19/2022; Returned: 06/01/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketLetter Index # 3: RE: Issuance of Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where YES FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CSC - Lawyers Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where a Foreign Limited Liability Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James R. Baudhuin