This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 09/13/2022 at 10:07:23 (UTC).

Felicia Franklin vs Tricolor Auto Group, LLC dba Tricolor Auto

Case Summary

On 01/03/2022 Felicia Franklin filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Tricolor Auto Group, LLC dba Tricolor Auto. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court at Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********14-3

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Franklin, Felicia

Defendants

Tricolor Auto Group, LLC

1999 Bryan St Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

dba Tricolor Auto, a limited liability company

b/s registered agent, CT Corporation System

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sharon K. Campbell

Defendant Attorney

Natalie M Brandt

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketDefendant's Original Answer Index # 4: Defendant's Original Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (137.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-178917: Franklin, Felicia: (221.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Franklin, Felicia; Total Financial Assessment: 358.00; Total Payments and Credits: 358.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 358.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketCitation: Mailed to Attorney 1/4/2022; Tricolor Auto Group, LLC: Served: 02/25/2022; Returned: 03/09/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRICOLOR AUTO GROUP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sharon K. Campbell