This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 06/23/2022 at 08:59:03 (UTC).

FedEx Corporation Services, Inc. vs J&M Family Management, LLC fka TLG Family Management, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/03/2022 FedEx Corporation Services, Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against J M Family Management, LLC fka TLG Family Management, LLC. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********98-1

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FedEx Corporation Services, Inc.

Defendants

J&M Family Management, LLC

5900 Balcones Drive Suite 100

Austin, TX 78731

fka TLG Family Management, LLC, Limited Liability Company

Registered Agents Inc

B/S Registered Agents Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Craig J. Luffy

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 5: J & M Family Management, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketLetter Index # 4: Return of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketCitation: Electronically served to attorney; J&M Family Management, LLC: Served: 05/25/2022; Returned: 06/08/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (137.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-181726: FedEx Corporation Services, Inc.: (221.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff FedEx Corporation Services, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment: 358.00; Total Payments and Credits: 358.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 358.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketCitation: Mailed to Attorney 5/3/22; J&M Family Management, LLC: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketLetter Index # 3: RE: Issuance of Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Registered Agents Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where FEDEX CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Craig J. Luffy