This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 02/27/2017 at 08:42:56 (UTC).

FARINA'S WINERY, LTD. vs ENTRUST COMPANIES, LLC D/B/A ENTRUST BANKCARD AND ELAVON, INC. D/B/A LADCO LEASING

Case Summary

On 11/08/2011 FARINA'S WINERY, LTD filed an Other lawsuit against ENTRUST COMPANIES, LLC D/B/A ENTRUST BANKCARD AND ELAVON, INC D/B/A LADCO LEASING. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 3 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Casey, Russell B. The case status is Pending - Appeal.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********9851

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2011

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Appeal

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 3

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Casey, Russell B

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FARINA'S WINERY, LTD.

Defendants

STATUTORY DOCUMENTS SECTIONS CITATIONS UNIT

ELAVON, INC. D/B/A LADCO LEASING C T CORPORATION SYSTEM

ENTRUST COMPANIES, LLC D/B/A ENTRUST BANKCARD SERVE: TEXAS SECRETARY OF STATE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Edward S Cox

Defendant Attorney

SEAN MICHAEL LYNCH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

10/10/2012

Dispositions: Final Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Casey, Russell B.) ; Judgment of $5,155.89; Awarded To: FARINA'S WINERY, LTD.; Awarded Against: ENTRUST COMPANIES, LLC D/B/A ENTRUST BANKCARD SERVE: TEXAS SECRETARY OF STATE, et al

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/04/2012

Comments: JUDGE APPROVED WRIT OF GARNISHMENT. CASE IS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/03/2012

Comments: PLTF ATTY SUBMITTED VIA FAX ORDER SUSTAINING PLTF'S PLEA TO THE JURISDICTION AND DISMISSING DEFN'S APPEAL (SIGNED ON 11/14/12 ) CCH

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/03/2012

Comments: PLTF ATTY SUBMITTED APPLICATION FOR WRIT GARNISHMENT. THIS CASE HAS BEEN APPEALED, CALLED PLTF ATTY AT 817-860-9200 AND ADVISED ADVISED OF SAME. HE ADVISED THE CCL DISMISSED THE CASE, HE ADVISED HE WILL FAX OVER PAPERWORK WHAT CCL DID TO CASE. ADVISED I WILL PRESENT TO JUDGE. CCH

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2012

Comments: JUDGE SIGNED TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT. MAILED NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES OF APPEAL. MADE COPY OF ALL PAPERWORK AND SENT ALL FILES TO CCL. CCH

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2012

Transcript of Judgment on Appeal Prepared: PRESENTED TO JUDGE FOR SIGNATURE ALONG WITH LETTER FOR PARTIES CCH

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/23/2012

Copies Requested: BY PLTF'S ATTY OF APPEAL BOND /JL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/22/2012

Appeal Bond Filed: BY DEFN ATTY. ATTY PAID 10.00 FEE FOR JP FILING FEE AND SUBMITTED CASHIERS CHECK FOR 219.00 FOR CCL FILING FEES (CK NUMBER 0805500360) PRESENTED TO JUDGE FOR REVIEW/SIGNATURE CCH

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2012

Comments: NOTICE OF APPEAL HAD INCORRECT DATE. THE ATTY DROPPED OFF AN AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL WITH THE CORRECT DATE. HMR

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/15/2012

Notice of Appeal Filed: APPEAL PAPERWORK GIVEN TO DEF'S ATTY ALONG WITH BOND AMOUNT OF $18,311.78

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
35 More Docket Entries
11/08/2011

Payment Receipt: RECEIPT OF PAYMENT | PAYMENT RECEIVED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2011

Original Petition Filed (OCA Opening): HURST

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2011

Historical Comments: JUSTICE SUIT PER PETITION FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT: JUDGMENT AFFIRMATIVELY DECLARING THAT THE LEASE AGREEMENT WITH LADCO IS INVALID AND UNEFORCEABLE, AWARDING PLAINTIFF ALL OF ITS DAMAGES AGAINST DEFENDANTS AS SET FORTH HEREINAWARDING PLANTIFF ITS REASONABLE ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS INCURRED,HEREIN AND GRANTING SUCH OTHER AND FURTHER RELIEF AT LAW OR IN EQUITY TO WHICH PLANTIFF MAY SHOW ITSELF JUSTLY ENTITLED.(MMD)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/23/2012

Counter Payment: Receipt # JP3-2012-04439: Cox, Edward S: (3.00)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/23/2012

Transaction Assessment: 3.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2011

Payment: Receipt # 0075863: FARINA'S WINERY, LTD.: (31.00)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2011

Transaction Assessment: 25.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2011

Financial Information: Plaintiff FARINA'S WINERY, LTD.; Total Financial Assessment: 34.00; Total Payments and Credits: 34.00; Balance Due as of 02/27/2017: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 6.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/22/2012

Counter Payment: Receipt # JP3-2012-04415: LYNCH, SEAN MICHAEL: (10.00)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/22/2012

Financial Information: Defendant ENTRUST COMPANIES, LLC D/B/A ENTRUST BANKCARD SERVE: TEXAS SECRETARY OF STATE; Total Financial Assessment: 10.00; Total Payments and Credits: 10.00; Balance Due as of 02/27/2017: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less