This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 01/09/2023 at 04:52:01 (UTC).

eXp Realty LLC vs. Yellowstone National Title, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/28/2022 eXp Realty LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Yellowstone National Title, LLC. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 7 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Sanders, Kenneth D. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0978

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Sanders, Kenneth D

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

eXp Realty LLC

1001 Mckinney St., Ste 1500

Houston, TX 77002

c/o McGlinchey Stafford, PLLC

Defendant

Yellowstone National Title, LLC

309 East Broad Street

Mansfield, TX 76063

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KATHLEEN JORDAN BRIEN

Defendant Attorney

David L Cook

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial: (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Sanders, Kenneth D)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketMailed: NJT NOTICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketEmailed: NJT NOTICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketCopies Emailed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketCopies Requested: PLTF SEEKING COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff Contacted Court: CHECK ON RETURN OF SERVICE // WILL REQT A COPY OF IT // GAVE HER JP7DESK EMAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketAnswer Filed: Defendant's Original Answer/ BY ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketAnswer Due On

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketAffidavit/Proof of Service Filed: AMENDED CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketCITATION: Yellowstone National Title, LLC: Served: 11/16/2022; Returned: 11/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketCitation Returned: ORIGINAL CITN // UNEXECUTED VIA EMAIL //THEN FOWARD TO CO7 FOR SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketCITATION: Yellowstone National Title, LLC: Unserved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketCitation Issued: ISSUED TO CO7 PER REQUEST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP7-2022-10314: eXp Realty LLC: (33.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff eXp Realty LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 204.00; Total Payments and Credits: 204.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketRequest for Service: Letter to Court to issue citation and have served by Constable/ CITN TO CO7

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff Contacted Court: INQUIRING ABOUT HAVING CONSTABLE SERVE/ PLTF WILL FILE SERVICE REQUEST AND PAY CONSTABLE FEE VIA EFILE ASAP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Petition: Small Claims Case// MISSING MILITARY AFF// UNABLE TO ACCEPT FOR CERTIFIED MAIL UNLESS PROVIDE PREPAID ENVELOPE// EMAIL CITN TO kbrien@mcglinchey.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EXP Realty, LLC is a litigant