This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/26/2022 at 13:22:19 (UTC).

In Re: The Estate of Paul B. Sandstrom, Deceased In Re: The Scott G. Sandstrom GST Exempt Trust

Case Summary

On 09/20/2021 In Re The Estate of Paul B Sandstrom, Deceased In Re The Scott G Sandstrom GST Exempt Trust was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is McGown, Quentin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************-1-B

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

McGown, Quentin

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Simmons Bank

2200 W 7Th St Ste 210

Fort Worth, TX 76107

Decedent

Sandstrom, Paul B.

Interested Party

Berl, Paulette Sandstrom

Fort Worth, TX 76108

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Kelly E. DeBerry

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketMotion for Non Suit Index # 7: Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketCANCELED: Application Hearing; (11:30 AM) (Judicial Officer McGown, Quentin) ; Per Attorney; via zoom/Succ Trustee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index # 6: Second Hearing Setting Letter 03/08/22 at 11:30 am

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index # 5: 03/08/2022 at 11:30 am

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-126593: Simmons Bank: (113.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 113.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketCitation - Personal: Paulette Berl; Berl, Paulette Sandstrom: Served: 12/28/2021; Returned: 01/05/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketConsent to Appointment Index # 4: and Waiver of Citation Susan Dyer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketConsent to Appointment Index # 3: and Waiver of Citation Scott Sandstrom

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PR-0365049: DeBerry, Kelly E.: (232.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Petitioner Simmons Bank; Total Financial Assessment: 345.00; Total Payments and Credits: 345.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 232.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketApplication for Successor Trustee Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Simmons Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kelly E. DeBerry