This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 05/02/2022 at 17:24:21 (UTC).

Estate of Lee Ann Huckaby, Deceased, In Re: Carol Huckaby Daley Childrens Trust

Case Summary

On 10/21/2021 Estate of Lee Ann Huckaby, Deceased, In Re Carol Huckaby Daley Childrens Trust was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Ponder, Christopher W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************-1-A

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Ponder, Christopher W

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Daley, Carol Huckaby

Arlington, TX 76005

Decedent

Huckaby, Lee Ann

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Aaron J. Shutt

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2022
  • Docket306 Notice Index # 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketOrder Setting Aside Prior Order Index # 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketJudgment/Order Index # 10: Approving Petition for Judicial Modification

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketMotion Index # 9: to set aside Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • Docket306 Notice Index # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketJudgment/Order Index # 7: Approving Petition for Judicial Modification******SET ASIDE 2-10-2022******

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketApplication Hearing: (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Ponder, Christopher W.) : via zoom/Trust Mod / hrg setting ltr needed - emailed atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index # 6: January 12, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketWaiver of Citation/Service Index # 5: William Daley

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketDeclination to Serve Index # 4: and Waiver- Esther Huckaby

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketWaiver of Citation/Service Index # 3: Donald Huckaby

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketWaiver of Citation/Service Index # 2: Baylor University

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PR-0365569: Daley, Carol Huckaby: (232.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Petitioner Daley, Carol Huckaby; Total Financial Assessment: 232.00; Total Payments and Credits: 232.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 232.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketPetition Index # 1: for Judicial Modification of Last Will and Testament

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Aaron J. Shutt